Terrasmart, Inc. v. Arch Insurance Company
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffery P Hopkins |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Hamilton County Common Pleas Court, A2401119 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 5:16 PM EDT |
Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrasmart, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 04/17 4:37 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Terrasmart, Inc. filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Hagan, J.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 3:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Arch Insurance Company, Arch Capital Group Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Arch Capital Group Ltd. for Arch Insurance Company.. (Hagan, J.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Arch Insurance Company originally filed on 3/8/2024 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2401119) by Terrasmart, Inc.. (zmc) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 3:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9913302) of William D. Deveau by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Hagan, J.) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A2401119 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9913150), filed by Arch Insurance Company. (Hagan, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Hamilton County Docket, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 04/10 4:39 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 4:43 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William D. Deveau as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 4/10/2024. (zmc) |