MASTROGIOVANNI v. O'MALLEY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth T Hey |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-01492 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 2:03 PM
ORDER DENYING2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL REMIT THE $350 FILING FEE AND $55 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 4/26/24. 4/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Social Security Magistrate Consent
Thu 04/25 4:43 PM
Social Security Magistrate Consent by DAVID JOHN MASTROGIOVANNI.. (FRIEDMAN, F.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 04/11 10:57 AM
Social Security Notice of Case Assignment(mas) |
|
Att: 1 consent | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 4:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DAVID JOHN MASTROGIOVANNI..(FRIEDMAN, F.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff)
Wed 04/10 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against MARTIN OMALLEY, filed by DAVID JOHN MASTROGIOVANNI.(FRIEDMAN, F.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Tracking form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form |