CHATHAM v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan N Bloch |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405(g) Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/15 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Quinn Niblack-Doggett on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Niblack-Doggett, Quinn) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Fri 04/12 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ), filed by CARRIE ANN CHATHAM. (rtm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 12:04 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the complaint attached to said motion. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 4/12/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dpo) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/12 11:09 AM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter Presiding. (rtm) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/12 11:41 AM
Judge Alan N. Bloch Presiding. Judge Susan Paradise Baxter no longer assigned to case. (rtm) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
ATTORNEY Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 4:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by CARRIE ANN CHATHAM. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |