B&C FAMILY, LLC
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10685 |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
B&C FAMILY, LLC
1141 Elden St Ste 224
Herndon, VA 20170-5572 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Gerard R. Vetter
Office of the U.S. Trustee - Region 4 1725 Duke Street Suite 650
Alexandria, VA 22314 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Response
Tue 04/30 10:50 PM
Response to filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Claim - First Case | ||
29 | 29
answer
Response
Tue 04/30 12:48 PM
Response to filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Claim - First Case | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 2:24 PM
Interim Objection to Cash Collateral Motion filed by David William Gaffey of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, LLP on behalf of Atlantic Union Bank. (Gaffey, David) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Hearing (Docketed by BNC)
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
Notice of Hearing (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Forms Request (VAN-022) Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/23 4:58 PM
Request for Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Jones, Mozelle) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 by Trustee/US Trustee
Tue 04/23 12:34 PM
Amended Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Fee Amount of $ 15 Exempt), Motion to Dismiss Case , Notice of Motion & Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. Filed by Jack Frankel of Office of the U.S. Trustee on behalf of Gerard R. Vetter (Frankel, Jack) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 by Trustee/US Trustee
Mon 04/22 2:07 PM
Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Fee Amount of $ 15 Exempt), Motion to Dismiss Case , Notice of Motion & Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA.Filed by Jack Frankel of Office of the U.S. Trustee on behalf of Gerard R. Vetter (Frankel, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion and Hearing | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing Cancelled
Thu 04/18 9:47 AM
Hearing Cancelled (Hall, Linda) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Wed 04/17 5:22 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/15 3:49 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing filed by David William Gaffey of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, LLP on behalf of Atlantic Union Bank. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Gaffey, David) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/15 3:46 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by David William Gaffey of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, LLP on behalf of Atlantic Union Bank. (Gaffey, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 04/15 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 04/15 12:11 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure
Sun 04/14 12:12 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Sun 04/14 12:12 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Sun 04/14 12:12 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Condition Rights of Debtor in Possession
Fri 04/12 3:41 PM
Consent Order Conditioning Rights of Debtor in Possession (Louis, Christy) |
|
13 | 13
order
Designation
Fri 04/12 2:19 PM
Order of Designation; designating George Kolakis to perform duties imposed upon the debtor by the Bankruptcy Code (Louis, Christy) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/12 10:25 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Forest, John) |
|
11 | 11
6
pgs
motion
Approve Use of Cash Collateral
Fri 04/12 10:18 AM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Assignment of Rents | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) UCC-1 Statement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) UCC-1 Statement - Continuation | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) UCC-1 Statement - Name Change | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Budget | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance //Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers filed by David William Gaffey of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, LLP on behalf of Atlantic Union Bank. (Gaffey, David) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
crditcrd
none
Thu 04/11 10:43 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition([LINK 24-10685 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A36129333, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Motion to Condition Rights of Debtor in Possession
Thu 04/11 5:41 PM
Motion to Condition Rights of Debtor in Possession Filed by Jack Frankel of Office of the U.S. Trustee on behalf of Gerard R. Vetter (Frankel, Jack) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 5:40 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jack Frankel of Office of the U.S. Trustee on behalf of Gerard R. Vetter. (Frankel, Jack) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Forms Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/11 11:43 AM
Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341 meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 01:00 PM at Alexandria division (11): Office of the U.S. Trustee, Telephonic meeting - see notice for details. Proof of Claims due by 8/14/2024. Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability of Debt due by 7/15/2024. (Louis, Christy) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/11 11:18 AM
Notice of Hearing filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Forest, John) |
|
4 | 4
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Thu 04/11 10:50 AM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/24/2024. Hearing scheduled for 5/14/2024 at 12:00 PM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Louis, Christy) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
motion
Employ
Wed 04/10 10:01 PM
Application to Employ John P. Forest, II as Counsel filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Declaration | ||
2 | 2
misc
Attorney Fee Disclosure
Wed 04/10 10:00 PM
Attorney Fee Disclosure filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Wed 04/10 5:28 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by John P. Forest II on behalf of B&C FAMILY, LLC. (Forest, John) |