Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Brian E Murphy
Case #: 1:24-cv-10932
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Case in other court:Cmnwlth of Massachusetts Superior Court, Suffolk, 2484-cv-000643
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
BNY Mellon Corp.
Represented By
Keri L. Engelman
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christy Hyder
Represented By
Adelaide H. Pagano
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Thomas P. Fowler
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/14 10:04 AM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery to be completed by 6/17/2025. Notice of Intent to call an expert witness to be filed by 6/17/2025 Plaintiffs trial expert under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) must be disclosed by 6/30/2025. Plaintiff's trial experts must be deposed by 7/28/2025. Defendant's trial expert under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) must be disclosed by 7/31/2025. Defendants trial experts must be deposed by 8/28/2025. Dispositive motions to be filed by 9/29/2025. To the extent neither party provides notice of intent to call an expert by 7/31/2025, the dispositive motion deadline will be set 8/29/2025. NOTICE OF HEARING: The Status Conference previously set for 3/19/2025 is RESCHEDULED until 6/17/2025 at 11:00 a.m. remotely by Zoom before Judge Brian E. Murphy. If counsel would prefer to appear in-person for this Conference, please contact the courtroom clerk 617) 748-9170 or Barbara_Beatty@mad.uscourts.gov at least 48 hours in advance. No later than 6/13/2025, parties are to file a joint status report. As appropriate, the report should indicate the status of discovery, as well as whether the parties anticipate: using expert witnesses; filing dispositive motions; requesting changes to the case schedule; and/or requesting a referral to the Courts mediation program. Parties may indicate if there is agreement that no conference appears necessary. (BIB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/11 10:03 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to deadlines set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order by BNY Mellon Corp..(Engelman, Keri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Reassignment Tue 01/21 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Brian E. Murphy added. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
15 15 minutes Status Conference Fri 12/13 10:06 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held by telephone on 12/13/2024. Case called; Status discussed. Deadlines and further conference to remain set re D.13 . (Attorneys present: THomas Fowler for the plainitff. Keri Engelman for the defendant.) (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Rescheduling Wed 12/04 10:51 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Status Conference set for 12/13/2024 10:00 AM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/31 4:01 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED: Initial disclosures to be completed by 8/6/24. Amendments to Pleadings to be filed by 1/31/25. Written discovery Related [+] shall be served no later than 2/3/25. Notice of intent to call an expert witness to be filed by 3/10/25. All deposition, other than expert depositions, and fact discovery must be completed by 3/17/25. Dispositive Motions must be filed by 5/22/25. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 12/4/2024 03:10 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Status Conference set for 3/19/2025 03:10 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-] quests for production of documents, interrogatories andrequest for admissions
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 07/31 3:51 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held by telephone on 7/31/2024. Case called; schedule and status conferences set. Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Thomas Fowler for the plaintiff. Keri Engelman for the defendant.) (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 misc Joint statement of counsel Wed 07/24 3:06 PM
JOINT STATEMENT of counsel .(Engelman, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Parties' Certifications of Compliance
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 07/15 3:50 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Motion to Continue NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2024 03:10 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
9 9 motion Continue Mon 07/08 11:04 AM
MOTION to Continue Initial Conference Unopposed by Defendant by Christy Hyder.(Fowler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/27 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2024 03:20 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.(McKillop, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Template Scheduling Order
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 06/25 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Thomas P. Fowler of Attorney Adelaide Pagano (Fowler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/25 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Fowler on behalf of Christy Hyder (Fowler, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/17 5:37 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint) by BNY Mellon Corp..(Engelman, Keri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Thu 04/11 9:55 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 04/11 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/10 6:04 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BNY MELLON CORP. identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for BNY MELLON CORP... (Engelman, Keri)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/10 6:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BNY MELLON CORP. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10361239 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Engelman, Keri)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings and orders,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Docket in the State Court Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ellen Sullivan,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Category Form