Washington v. Chelsea School et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paula Xinis |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-01055 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1441 Removal-Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Prince George's County, C-16-CV-23-05830 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 6:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools
14201 School Lane
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trinell Bowman
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772
|
|
Defendant
Chelsea School
2970 Belcrest Center Drive Suite 300
Hyattsville, MD 20782 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Millard House, II
in his official capacity as CEO of Prince George's County Public Schools 14201 School Lane
Upper Marlboro, MD 20772 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kedan A. James
in his individual and in his official capacity as Fine Arts Teacher at The Chelsea School 715 Larchmont Avenue
Capitol Heights, MD 20743 |
|
Defendant
Frank Mills
2970 Belcrest Center Drive Suite 300
Hyattsville, MD 20782 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristal Weems-Bradner
in her official capacity Head of School 2970 Belcrest Center Drive Suite 300
Hyattsville, MD 20782 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim Washington
In her capacity as Parent and Guardian of K.W., a minor 16701 Melford Blvd Suite 400
Bowie, MD 20715 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Krew on behalf of Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools, Millard House, II (Krew, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/19 3:16 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chelsea School, Frank Mills, Kristal Weems-Bradner identifying Party with Financial Interest Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company for Chelsea School, Frank Mills, Kristal Weems-Bradner.(Viola, Gregg) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/17 3:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Chelsea School, Frank Mills, Kristal Weems-Bradner(Viola, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Defendants Chelsea School, Frank Mills, and Kristal Weems-Bradner's Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/17 1:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools, Millard House, II(Krew, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 4:43 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kim Washington (Massey, Kimm) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 10:01 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools, Millard House, II (Krew, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Response
Mon 04/15 9:42 AM
RESPONSE re4 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools, Millard House, II.(Krew, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response
Fri 04/12 2:29 PM
RESPONSE re4 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Chelsea School, Frank Mills, Kristal Weems-Bradner.(Viola, Gregg) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
corresp
Miscellaneous
Thu 04/11 10:54 AM
Removal Notification Letter mailed to Defendants Kedan A. James and Trinell Bowman. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 4/11/24) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions
Thu 04/11 10:47 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 04/11 10:47 AM
QC NOTICE re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Millard House, II, Frank Mills, Kristal Weems-Bradner, Chelsea School, Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools. **Please note that pursuant to this Court's Filing Procedures for Removals, each attachment is to be properly labeled as to what the state court document is (i.e., Complaint, Answer, etc.) (see https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/content/removals), and not by the Exhibit Letter/Number. The Clerk has made edits to the entry. No further action required. Thank you (dass, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools, Trinell Bowman, Chelsea School, Millard House, II, Kedan A. James, Frank Mills, Kristal Weems-Bradner, filed by Kim Washington.(dass, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number C-16-CV-23-005830. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11196586), filed by Frank Mills, Board of Education for Prince George's County Public Schools, Chelsea School, Millard House, II, Kristal Weems-Bradner.(Viola, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
utility
Remark - State Court Docs
Thu 04/11 10:43 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPER FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk) |