Gleen Rock Inc. v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02724 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 6:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gleen Rock Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/18 9:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Juan Paolo Dizon. RE-FILE Document No. 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected (Do Not Select Any Group). Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/17 6:43 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Gleen Rock Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Dizon, Juan Paolo) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/15 4:28 PM
ORDER granting4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before May 15, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 4. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/15/2024) (rro) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/15 4:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. answer due 5/15/2024. (rro) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/12 7:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint from April 17 to May 15, 2024, addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ruarri Rogan dated April 12, 2024. Document filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc...(Rogan, Ruarri) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 10:24 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 10:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 10:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 5:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate ICE Mortgage Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. Document filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc...(Rogan, Ruarri) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 5:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rogan, Ruarri) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 801927/2024E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29202526).Document filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc...(Rogan, Ruarri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Part 2 - Property Documents |