Miller v. Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02725 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331pi Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 6:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Oliver Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service Other
Thu 04/25 8:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Katherine Polk Faila, United States Magistrate Judges Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on John T. Mills on April 25, 2025. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 04/24 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Accordingly, Plaintiff Hansen's motion to consolidate the above-captioned cases and for appointment of interim lead class counsel is DENIED without prejudice to its later renewal in connection with the parties' filing of the Proposed Stipulation to Consolidate Actions and Set Scheduling Deadlines discussed below. (Dkt. #6). Defendant's deadline to answer move or otherwise respond to the complaints in the above-captioned cases is hereby STAYED until the Court has addressed the issue of consolidation. (Dkt. #9). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motions at docket entries 6 and 9 in case number 24 Civ. 2194 (KPF). (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/23/2024) (jca) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/24 7:53 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. Service was accepted by Alexia Regman, Facilities Manager. Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Mon 04/15 2:27 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02194-KPF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 04/15 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 2:29 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 4:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc...(pc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 2:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc., re:5 Complaint. Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
5 | 5
59
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc.. Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/11 10:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Victoria Jennings Maniatis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Genesee;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/11 10:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Victoria Jennings Maniatis to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption title does not indicate the document being filed (Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 10:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Victoria Jennings Maniatis to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 4:39 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 4:39 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Thu 04/11 4:40 PM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 24cv2194 (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Wed 04/10 5:50 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 24-cv-02194-KPF. Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 5:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 5:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Maniatis, Victoria) |
|
1 | 1
59
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Gerson Lehrman Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29202708)Document filed by Oliver Miller..(Maniatis, Victoria) |