Derks v. Chemeketa Community College
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Ann L Aiken |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00612 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1681 Discrimination Based on Sex or Blindness |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Marion County Circuit Court, 24CV13323 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 5:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
Chemeketa Community College
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Derks
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal
Wed 04/17 10:01 AM
Defendant's Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal with Jury Demand . Filed by Chemeketa Community College. (Jacobson, Rebekah) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Correction of the Record
Tue 04/16 11:59 AM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding1 Notice of Removal (Attachment 3 - Civil Cover Sheet). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Mon 04/15 1:20 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/13/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/12/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/12/2024. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (le) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 3:21 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 4/10/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 3:13 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 24CV13323 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9363730 (In forma pauperis status selected) . Filed by Chemeketa Community College. (Jacobson, Rebekah) Modified on 4/10/2024 to correct payment information. NEF regenerated. (le) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint from state court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Assignment of Trial Judge from state court, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet |