California Central District Court
Judge:Michelle Williams Court
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:24-cv-00789
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Jan 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By
Seth M Gerber
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
NFP Property and Casualty Services, Inc.
Represented By
Ramon Ramirez
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Eric Jordan Amdursky
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
James M. Witz
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Jessica F. Pizzutelli
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Alliant Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By
Seth M Gerber
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NFP Property and Casualty Services, Inc.
Represented By
Ramon Ramirez
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Eric Jordan Amdursky
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
James M. Witz
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Jessica F. Pizzutelli
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
54 54 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/28 3:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Michelle Williams Court, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case53 . THE COURT HEREBY APPROVES THE STIPULATION AND ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: This action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety including as to all claims and counterclaims asserted by the Parties against each other. No party is a "prevailing party" for purposes of this action, and each of the Parties shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
53 53 stip Dismiss Case Mon 01/27 4:52 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff NFP Property and Casualty Services, Inc..(Amdursky, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order