Hedges v. Anchor Beverages, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale E Ho |
Referred: | Sarah L Cave |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02727 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Anchor Beverages, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Hedges
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Assoiciates PLLC 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 4:35 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 4/11/2024) (ks) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Donna Hedges..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 11:20 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anchor Beverages, Inc...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 11:12 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 11:14 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 11:14 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/11 11:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 11:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 11:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anchor Beverages, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 10:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Anchor Beverages, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29203185)Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |