Hedges v. Smith Teamaker, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer H Rearden |
Referred: | Valerie Figueredo |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02728 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith Teamaker, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Hedges
On Behalf Of Herself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Assoiciates PLLC 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/15 3:05 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/15/2024) (va) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 3:03 PM
ORDER: In addition, to conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the designated Magistrate Judge. If all parties so consent, counsel shall file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/consent-proceed-us-magistrate-judge. If the parties do so, and the Court so orders the form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the designated Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned. There will be no adverse consequences if the parties do not consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/15/2024) (va) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Donna Hedges..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 11:21 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Smith Teamaker, LLC..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 11:10 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 11:10 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 11:10 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/11 11:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 11:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 11:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Smith Teamaker, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 10:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Smith Teamaker, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29203191)Document filed by Donna Hedges..(LaBollita, Michael) |