Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:24-cv-00891
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Assetcare, LLC
Represented By
Bradley J. St. Angelo
Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Gerena
Represented By
Cortney Walters
The Law Office Of Cortney E Walters, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, June 14, 2024
16 16 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 06/14 8:15 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
15 15 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/13 12:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of Plaintiff's "Notice of Settlement" (Doc. 14 ), this cause is hereby dismissed without prejudice, subject to the right of the parties within 60 days of the date hereof to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, a request for an extension of time, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 6/13/2024. (ANL)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of settlement Thu 06/13 12:00 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Joshua Gerena (Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
12 12 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 06/11 12:33 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 6/11/2024. (DIGITAL) (KAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/29 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re:6 Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for Consideration of the Inexpensive Determination, Efficient, and Abbreviated Litigation (IDEAL) Program (IDEAL Referral Order). For the reasons set forth in the IDEAL Referral Order, a case management conference is set for June 11, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite via Zoom videoconference. The parties should review the IDEAL Referral Order in advance of the hearing and be prepared to discuss any procedures that they believe could streamline discovery, motions practice, and trial. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom videoconference invitation by separate email. Each person who participates in the proceeding must attend using his or her own device so that he or she appears on a separate screen during the videoconference. (MEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Wed 05/29 12:34 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting the parties' 9 Joint Motion to Request Case Management Conference. The Court will set a case management conference by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/29/2024. (MEL)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 25, 2024
9 9 motion Hearing / Conference Sat 05/25 10:33 AM
Joint MOTION for Case Management Conference by Joshua Gerena.(Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/13 6:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Assetcare, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Capio Management, LLC for Assetcare, LLC. (St. Angelo, Bradley)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/13 6:48 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Assetcare, LLC.(St. Angelo, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Tue 04/23 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (AMS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 service Summons issued Thu 04/11 1:51 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Assetcare, LLC. (EVK)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/11 8:22 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-891-TPB-CPT. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/10 9:58 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Joshua Gerena. (Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/10 9:57 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Joshua Gerena. Related case(s): No (Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 9:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Assetcare, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21969909) filed by Joshua Gerena.(Walters, Cortney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons