Ceus et al v. IH3 Property Georgia, L.P. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01514 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
IH3 Property Borrower, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IH3 Property Georgia, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THR Property Management, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XYZ Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esthesia Ceus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomesia Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 04/17 10:05 AM
IH Defendants ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Petition and Complaint for Damages by IH3 Property Borrower, L.P., IH3 Property Georgia, L.P., THR Property Management, L.P.. Discovery ends on 9/16/2024.(Rosenkoff, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 2:53 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by IH3 Property Borrower, L.P., IH3 Property Georgia, L.P., THR Property Management, L.P., XYZ Corporation. (gww) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13352649) filed by IH3 Property Borrower, L.P., THR Property Management, L.P., XYZ Corporation, IH3 Property Georgia, L.P..(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Documents Filed in the State Court Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |