Ross v. Sam's East, Incorporated et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Anne M Nardacci |
Referred: | Christian F Hummel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00492 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Joseph Goodnough
|
|
Defendant
Sam's East, Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Bridget Woodall-Fary
|
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Ross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Text Notice of Filing Deficiency
Thu 04/11 8:48 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Ashley Ross regarding the1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. ****ATTACHMENT 1 - Exhibit EEOC Letter to Dkt 1- contains a home address.**** Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 4/16/2024 (hmr) |
||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Thu 04/11 2:55 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re1 Complaint: Redacted copy of attachment1 Exhibit EEOC Letter has been uploaded and attached to Dkt. No.1 . The unredacted copies of Exhibit EEOC Letter is now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2. (hmr) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Wed 04/10 12:19 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/9/2024 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/2/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/10/2024) (hmr, ). |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 12:17 PM
Summonses Issued as to Joseph Goodnough, Sam's East, Incorporated, Bridget Woodall-Fary.(hmr) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued for Joseph Goodnough, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Bridget Woodall-Fary | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Wed 04/10 12:48 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re3 G.O. 25 Filing Order: Clerk replaced this document with a corrected version, since the original document contained typographical errors in the caption. (hmr) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joseph Goodnough, Sam's East, Incorporated, Bridget Woodall-Fary (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6689281) filed by Ashley Ross.(hmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |