Hamilton v. Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joshua D Wolson |
Referred: | Carol Sandra Moore Wells |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01446 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Middle, 3:24-cv-00449 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 11:06 PM EDT |
Petitioner
Barry Lee Hamilton
KX5316 SCI - Fayette SPECIAL MAIL - OPEN ONLY IN PRESENCE OF INMATE 50 Overlook Drive
LaBelle, PA 15450 |
|
Respondent
COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
800 SPRING GARDEN STREET
PHILA, PA 19123 |
|
Respondent
PENNSYLVANIA ATTORNEY GENERAL
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/25 11:57 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE BUCKS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE AND THE PA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. IGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/25/24. 4/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED. (mbh) |
|
misc
Remark
Thu 04/25 12:52 PM
Copy of Order #13 mailed to Hamilton. (fdc) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/24 9:47 AM
Notice of Election filed by Barry Lee Hamilton. (mbh) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 10:58 AM
ORDER THAT THE PETITION THAT MR. HAMILTON FILED DOES NOT CONTAIN THE INSTRUCTIONS ANDWARNINGS THAT ARE CONTAINED IN THE COURTS STANDARD FORM. IF MR. HAMILTON DID NOT INTEND TO INITIATE A FEDERAL HABEAS PROCEEDING, OR IF, AFTER REVIEW OF THIS ORDER, INCLUDING THE WARNINGS IN PARAGRAPH 1, MR. HAMILTON DECIDE NOT TO PURSUE THIS ACTION, MR. HAMILTON MAY FILE A NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A). BEFORE DOING SO, HOWEVER, MR. HAMILTON MUST REVIEW THE WARNINGS SET FORTH ABOVE, WHICH EXPLAIN CERTAIN FEATURES OF THE HABEAS STATUTES, INCLUDING THE RELEVANT STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS. IF MR. HAMILTON FAILS TO COMPLETE AND RETURN THE NOTICE OF ELECTION FORM TO THIS COURT ON OR BEFORE MAY 17, 2024, THEN I WILL RULE ON THE CURRENT PETITION, AS FILED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/12/24. 4/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Wed 04/10 9:06 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 04/10 8:58 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00449. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
Remark
Wed 04/10 9:08 AM
Pro Se Guidelines Mailed Out on 4/10/24. (sbt) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),DIRECTING Clerk of Court to TRANSFER CASE to the Eastern District of PA; Financial determination shall be left to the discretion of the transferee court; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 4/5/24. (sm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
7 | 7 4 pgs MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 4/5/24. (sm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Warden and petitioner. Signed by LP on 04/01/2024. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 (UNCERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Barry Lee Hamilton. (ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
4 | 4 (UNCERTIFIED) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barry Lee Hamilton.(ep) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/14/2024. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
Att: 1 IFP (Habeas Corpus) | ||
2 | 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] | |
Att: 1 AO 85 Notice & Consent | ||
1 | 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Barry Lee Hamilton. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/10/2024.] |