JOHNSON v. TERRA et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joshua D Wolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01465 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 04/30 11:55 AM
COPY OF DOCUMENT #6 REMAILED TO PRO SE. (ke) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Returned Mail
Thu 04/25 1:42 PM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 4/5/24 (Document # 5) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to JOSHUA TAYLOR JOHNSON for the following reason: REFUSED. (amas) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 04/16 11:25 AM
Document 6 mailed to JOSHUA TAYLOR JOHNSON. (mac) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 12:07 PM
ORDER THAT MR. JOHNSON'S1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 4/15/24.4/15/24 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO JOHNSON.(fdc) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Wed 04/10 1:08 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. MAILED TO JOHNSON. (fdc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 04/10 1:04 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOSHUA TAYLOR JOHNSON. (fdc) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/10 1:03 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by JOSHUA TAYLOR JOHNSON..(fdc) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against ALEX, BRUCE, CRAMP, DAGER, LANE, MEDICAL DEPARTMENT OF SCI PHOENIX, OVERTON-WELLS, K. PATTERSON, PISTON, TERRA, JOSHUA TERRA, filed by JOSHUA TAYLOR JOHNSON. *IFP PENDING*(fdc) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 1:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOSHUA TAYLOR JOHNSON..(fdc) |