Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Katherine A Crytzer
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:24-cv-00166
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Aug 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Malibu Boats, LLC
Represented By
Ian R. Shapiro
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Taylor Andrew Williams
Paine Tarwater & Bickers LLP
contact info
Russell Capone
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Malibu Boats, Inc.
Represented By
Ian R. Shapiro
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Taylor Andrew Williams
Paine Tarwater & Bickers LLP
contact info
Russell Capone
Cooley, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MKB Florida Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Larsons Marine
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
High Country Watersports, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Nicholas Warren Diegel
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, Pc (knox)
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Scott D Carey
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (nashville)
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Phoenix, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Lewisville, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Knoxville, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Detroit, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's Castaic, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tommy's California Ventura, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Albert Zager
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher J Zdarsky
Bodman PLC
contact info
Thomas H Dundon
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
James Isaac Sanders
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info
Christopher James Zdarsky
Butzel Long
contact info
Philip N Elbert
Neal & Harwell, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 19, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/19 3:39 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE: Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice satisfied the requirements for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) [See Doc. 39]. As such, Plaintiffs Notice was effective on July 3, 2024 when filed, and no order from this Court is required. Because no issues remain in this action, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to close the case.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 8/19/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
notice Notice of Failure to File Consent/Non-Consent Thu 08/15 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (ABF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/03 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by High Country Watersports, LLC, Larsons Marine, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC(Elbert, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Order
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/03 2:06 PM
NOTICE by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC Notice and Certification Regarding Meet and Confer (Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/25 4:26 PM
NOTICE by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC Regarding Motion to Dismiss (Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 06/25 2:48 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 06/25/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
35 35 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Tue 06/25 9:53 AM
Now before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Seal Confidential Information [Doc. 33], which seeks to seal Exhibits 3 and 4 [SEALED Docs. 34, 34-1] to their motion to dismiss. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 33] , and Exhibits 3 and 4 [ Docs. 34, 34-1 ] SHALL REMAIN SEALED . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 6/25/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Annotation Tue 06/25 3:30 PM
Gavel Orders, Docs. 30 and 31 mailed to attorneys Shapiro and Capone. (CAT)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Annotation Tue 06/25 3:33 PM
Gavel Order, Doc. 35 mailed to attorneys Shapiro, Capone, Gates, Jr. and Zdarsky. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
34 34 misc Proposed Sealed Document Mon 06/24 11:35 PM
SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re:33 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC .(Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
33 33 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 06/24 11:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC. (Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/24 11:33 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC.(Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
31 31 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/24 5:43 PM
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 06/24/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/24 5:42 PM
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 06/24/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Mon 06/24 11:33 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete as to Ian Shapiro regarding document: 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ian Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5710311.) filed by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC (SLM)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Mon 06/24 11:34 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Russell Capone regarding document: 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell Capone ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5710348.) filed by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC (SLM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
29 29 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/21 3:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell Capone ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5710348.) by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC.(Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/21 3:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ian Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5710311.) by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC.(Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, June 17, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Mon 06/17 3:15 PM
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Scott D Carey and Nicholas Warren Diegel terminated. (Diegel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 11:19 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 06/13/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 11:18 AM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 06/13/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order Thu 06/13 11:14 AM
Now before the Court is the Response filed on June 10, 2024 [Doc. 20] to the Courts Show Cause Order [Doc. 11]. The Response states that the Plaintiffs lender M&T Bank, obtained an Order appointing a Receiver over Plaintiffs on April 22, 2024. Plaintiffs have since filed for bankruptcy-which has divested M&T Banks Receiver of authority to prosecute this lawsuit. Attorney Gates has filed the appropriate pro hac motion [Doc. 19]. Therefore, the Court hereby DISCHARGES its Order to Show Cause [Doc. 11]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 06/13/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Thu 06/13 11:11 AM
Now before the Court is the Response filed on June 10, 2024 [Doc. 20] to the Courts Show Cause Order [Doc. 10]. The Response states that the Plaintiffs lender M&T Bank, obtained an Order appointing a Receiver over Plaintiffs on April 22, 2024. Plaintiffs have since filed for bankruptcy-which has divested M&T Banks Receiver of authority to prosecute this lawsuit. Attorney Zdarsky has filed the appropriate pro hac motion [Doc. 18]. Therefore, the Court hereby DISCHARGES its Order to Show Cause [Doc. 10]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 06/13/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Annotation Thu 06/13 2:04 PM
Gavel Orders Docs. 23-26 mailed to attorneys Christopher Zdarsky and Floyd Gates, Jr. (SLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Deficiency (PDF) Tue 06/11 11:26 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (PDF): Attachment in fillable format. (LCK)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Tue 06/11 11:49 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Zdarsky ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5699898.) filed by Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Larsons Marine, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, High Country Watersports, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC (LCK)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Tue 06/11 11:53 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Floyd E. Gates, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5699902.) filed by Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Larsons Marine, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, High Country Watersports, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC (LCK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/10 7:14 PM
NOTICE by High Country Watersports, LLC, Larsons Marine, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC re20 Response to Order to Show Cause, Notice of Filing of Exhibits C and D(Zager, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C - Declaration of Floyd E. Gates, Jr.,
Att: 2 Exhibit D - Declaration of Christopher J. Zdarsky
20 20 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 06/10 6:34 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by High Country Watersports, LLC, Larsons Marine, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC.(Zager, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order for Appointing Receiver,
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter to Receiver
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/10 6:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Floyd E. Gates, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5699902.) by High Country Watersports, LLC, Larsons Marine, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC. (Zager, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/10 6:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Zdarsky ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5699898.) by High Country Watersports, LLC, Larsons Marine, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC. (Zager, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Isaac Sanders on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sanders, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Albert Zager on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zager, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H Dundon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dundon, Thomas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/10 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip N Elbert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Elbert, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/03 12:47 PM
Now before the Court is the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. 12]. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 12] . Defendants SHALL respond to the Complaint on or before June 24, 2024 . See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 7.2 ("Under exceptional circumstances, the Court may act upon a motion prior to the expiration of the response time."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 6/3/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Sun 06/02 5:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Malibu Boats, Inc., Malibu Boats, LLC. (Williams, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/28 11:04 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS Attorney Gates to show cause on or before June 11, 2024 , why he should not be removed as an attorney of record in this case and why other appropriate sanctions should not issue for his failure to comply with the Notice. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause to Attorney Gates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 05/28/2024. (Copy of Order to Show Cause mailed to Attorney Gates) (CAT)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/28 10:52 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS Attorney Zdarsky to show cause on or before June 11, 2024 , why he should not be removed as an attorney of record in this case and why other appropriate sanctions should not issue for his failure to comply with the Notice. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order to Show Cause to Attorney Zdarsky. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 05/28/2024. (Copy of Order to Show Cause mailed to Attorney Zdarsky) (CAT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Citizenship Wed 04/17 3:00 PM
Certificate of Citizenship by High Country Watersports, LLC, Larsons Marine, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC. (Carey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Fri 04/12 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Christopher J. Zdarsky. (c/em to Attorney Chritopher J. Zdarsky) (KDO)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Fri 04/12 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Floyd E. Gates, Jr. (c/em to Attorney Floyd E. Gates) (KDO)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 04/12 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(KDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Malibu LLC
5 5 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Fri 04/12 9:39 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/12/24. (KDO)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Fri 04/12 9:38 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/12/24. (KDO)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Fri 04/12 9:37 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/12/24. (KDO)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship Fri 04/12 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by All Plaintiffs. (KDO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
2 2 2 pgs misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Wed 04/10 6:05 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by High Country Watersports, LLC d/b/a Tommy's Colorado, Larsons Marine d/b/a Tommy's SacramentoTommy's, Larsons Marine d/b/a Tommy's Stockton, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC d/b/a Tommy's Florida, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC d/b/a Tommy's Michigan. (Carey, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5646392.), filed by Tommy's Chattanooga, LLC, Tommy's Phoenix, LLC, Tommy's California Ventura, LLC, Tommy's Castaic, LLC, Tommy's Lewisville, LLC, MKB Florida Holdings, LLC d/b/a Tommy's Florida, Larsons Marine d/b/a Tommy's Stockton, Tommy's Knoxville, LLC, Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC, Tommy's Detroit, LLC, Tommy's Grand Rapids, LLC, Tommy's Las Vegas, LLC, Larsons Marine d/b/a Tommy's SacramentoTommy's, Walloon Lake Village Marina, LLC d/b/a Tommy's Michigan, High Country Watersports, LLC d/b/a Tommy's Colorado.(Carey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for Malibu Boats, Inc.,
Att: 2 Summons for Malibu Boats, LLC,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/12 8:37 AM
District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (KDO)
Related: [-]