Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colin Stirling Bruce
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 2:24-cv-02077
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 3:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Represented By
Douglass Robert Nolan
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Becky L Kalas
Ford & Harrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeff Watts
Represented By
Kathryn Averwater
Casey Jones Law Firm
contact info
Nicholas D Thompson
Casey Jones Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
order Order Wed 11/13 4:30 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/13/2024. The telephone status conference set for 12/2/24 is VACATED. The parties should inform the court by email (long@ilcd.uscourts.gov) if they require a status conference. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/21 8:53 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/21/2024. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/24. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting10 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 7/8/24, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 11/15/24, discovery closes 10/1/25, case dispositive motions due 12/1/25. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/26 at 11:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 4/21/26 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 12/2/24 at 10:15 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574. (BL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
10 10 misc Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 06/19 3:28 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Jeff Watts. (Averwater, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/07 3:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Norfolk Southern Railway Co.(Kalas, Becky)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 21 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/10 2:46 PM
ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 05/10/2024. IT IS ORDERED This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on June 26, 2024, at 9:45 a.m., Courtroom B, U.S. Courthouse, 201 South Vine Street, Urbana, Illinois. If an agreed discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) is filed seven days before the hearing, the Court will adopt the schedule and vacate the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. See full written Order. (DW)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 05/10 2:42 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/10/2024. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time6 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 6/8/24. (DW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 05/09 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Douglass Robert Nolan on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Co (Nolan, Douglass)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/09 9:19 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Co. Responses due by 5/23/2024 (Kalas, Becky)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 05/09 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Becky L Kalas on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Co (Kalas, Becky)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 04/26 9:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kathryn Averwater on behalf of Jeff Watts (Averwater, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Mon 04/22 10:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff Watts. Norfolk Southern Railway Co served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. (Thompson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/11 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (Mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service.) (TC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Attorney Complaint Wed 04/10 8:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Co. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4447587.), filed by Jeff Watts.(Thompson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Requested