Top Metal Buyers Inc. et al v. Lopinot et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gilbert C Sison |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01073 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Joe Aiello
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Lopinot
|
|
Defendant
Sangamon County
|
|
Defendant
St. Clair County
|
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Beechler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelly Branson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Ferrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Gilliam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trenise Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Mosby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Top Metal Buyers Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/30 4:13 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re3 Notice (Other) Service by Certified Mail on IL AG(Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Joe Aiello waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sangamon County waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. St. Clair County waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/29 3:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Andrew Lopinot waiver sent on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/16 12:46 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint of Constitutional Questions (Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment
Thu 04/11 8:02 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: All Plaintiffs. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 24-1073 GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/2/2024 (tkm) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
36
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 9:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5362548.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Suhr, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |