Grand Central Provisions, Inc. v. Reisert & Associates, Inc. et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00439 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Davidson, Tennessee, 24C90 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Auto-Owners Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Reisert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reisert & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grand Central Provisions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 04/30 1:03 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Headrick, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 4:44 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Grand Central Provisions, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 7:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Headrick, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 12:42 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reisert & Associates, Inc.. (Humphreys, James) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 12:42 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gregory Reisert. (Humphreys, James) |
|
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Fri 04/12 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 ,9 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (mg) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 10:20 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reisert & Associates, Inc.. (Humphreys, James) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 10:17 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gregory Reisert. (Humphreys, James) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 9:57 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Headrick, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 9:55 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Headrick, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Wed 04/10 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 04/10 5:07 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Wed 04/10 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Wed 04/10 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Davidson, Tennessee, case number 24C90. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4053923)(ad) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - 1 Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit - 2 Agreed Order | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 04/10 5:21 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew J. Evans, Daniel C. Headrick, Michael K. Smith, James N. L. Humphreys admitted to this court . (ad) |