Phillips v. McCraw et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00441 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Robert McCraw
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Moving Depot LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 1:12 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 04/11 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 7/25/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 04/11 8:28 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 04/11 8:28 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 04/11 8:29 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Britt Phillips, Brendon Charles Pashia, Robert B. Keaty, II admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/11 8:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Robert McCraw.(kc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 8:24 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Moving Depot LLC. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert McCraw from Sumner County Circuit Court, case number 2023-cv-753. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4054420)(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Disclosure Statement |