California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-01393
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 12:30 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Richard Clay Roberts (1)
Terminated: 03/12/2024
Represented By
Claire Rogerson
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 1:16 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
Notice to Southern District of California of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant Richard Clay Roberts. Your case number is: 19CR4517. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:10 Warrant of Removal and Commitment to Another District. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Richard Clay Roberts, originating in the Southern District of California. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3583. Signed by agent Matthew Starr, USMS, DUSM. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Richard Clay Roberts; defendants Year of Birth: 1964; date of arrest: 3/11/2024 USMS# REG 89522-298 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 Defendant Richard Clay Roberts arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Southern District of California at San Diego.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Richard Clay Roberts (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson as to Defendant Richard Clay Roberts. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order).Contested detention hearing held,granting4 REQUEST for Detention as to Richard Clay Roberts (1). Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Claire Rogerson for Richard Clay Roberts, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Court orders defendant held to answer to Southern District of California. Warrant of Removal and final commitment to issue. Government will provide any known court dates to D/A. Defendnat does not waive the preliminary hearing to be held in the Southern District of California. Court Smart: CS 3/12/24. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson as to Defendant Richard Clay Roberts, (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Richard Clay Roberts. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS filed by Defendant Richard Clay Roberts (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Richard Clay Roberts. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 WARRANT OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson that Defendant Richard Clay Roberts be removed to the Southern District of California (mhe)
Related: [-]