Kansas District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-10033
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 9:38 PM CDT
Defendant
Jessie Steve Trujillo (1)
Represented By
Mitch Erik Biebighauser
Office Of Federal Public Defender - Wichita
contact info
Ellen Christine Bertels
Federal Public Defenders, District Of Kansas
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kari Burks
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/31/2024 9:38 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT filed as to Jessie Steve Trujillo on counts 1 and 2. (mls) Modified on 3/19/2024 to unseal upon arrest. (kao)
Related: [-]