Patel v. The United States et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02140 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Stanford Junior University
|
|
Defendant
The United States
|
|
Plaintiff
Raj K. Patel
The Excellent The Excellent 4330 Strathmore Lane
Zionville, IN 46077 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Withdraw
Mon 04/29 10:26 AM
ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Complaint and Terminate Case. The Clerk of Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/29/2024. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw
Sat 04/27 7:38 AM
MOTION to Withdraw filed by Raj Patel. Responses due by 4/29/2024. Replies due by 4/29/2024. (Patel, Raj) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 6:06 PM
Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Strike
Thu 04/18 3:33 PM
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 8 AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; TERMINATING MOTIONS. Payment of filing fees or Second Amended IFP Application due 5/2/2024. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/18/2024. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Strike
Tue 04/16 1:27 PM
MOTION to Strike3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Raj Patel. Responses due by 4/30/2024. Replies due by 5/7/2024. (Patel, Raj) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/16 1:24 PM
Amended MOTION re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis IFP Motion filed by Raj Patel. Responses due by 4/30/2024. Replies due by 5/7/2024. (Patel, Raj) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 1:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raj Patel.. (Patel, Raj) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 04/10 5:40 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 09:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/10 5:38 PM
Proposed Summons. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 5:37 PM
MOTION for Service by The Clerk filed by Raj K. Patel. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Wed 04/10 5:33 PM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Raj K. Patel.(msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 5:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Raj K. Patel. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Stanford Junior University, The United States. Filed by Raj K. Patel.(msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/22 2:55 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 at 09:30 AM in San Jose, Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF) |