Venture Goods LLC v. Venture Apparel, Inc
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | P Casey Pitts |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02143 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 8:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Venture Apparel, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Venture Goods LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 04/30 11:41 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, filed by Venture Goods LLC.. (Sullera, Gabrielle) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 04/12 1:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Venture Goods LLC. re1 Complaint, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,5 Summons Issued (Sullera, Gabrielle) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Sullera (Sullera, Gabrielle) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/11 10:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEADLINE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Venture Apparel, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 04/10 9:21 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 04/10 8:50 AM
Case assigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Punzalan, Mark) | |
1 | 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against VENTURE APPAREL, INC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19305397.). Filed by VENTURE GOODS LLC.(Punzalan, Mark) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet |