Google LLC v. Goel
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02160 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Surendra Goel
|
|
Plaintiff
Google LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 05/01 4:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/30 1:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Mar, Eugene) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Tue 04/16 4:04 PM
SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:23-CV-05806 PCP with 5:24-cv-02160 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/16/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 1:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Surendra Goel. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/16 1:39 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 12:54 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 04/11 11:53 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet. Please refile your Civil Cover Sheet with the Divisional Assignment marked. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file Civil Cover Sheet in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Google LLC (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/10 7:47 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Mar, Eugene) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Wed 04/10 7:35 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Mar, Eugene) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/10 7:32 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mar, Eugene) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 7:25 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement against Surendra Goel ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19309672.). Filed by Google LLC.(Mar, Eugene) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Tue 04/16 1:31 PM
REPORT3 on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (kmg, COURT STAFF) |