Garcia-Navarro v. Hogar La Bella Union, Inc., et al
Original Case: 3:17-cv-01271
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01323 |
Type | civil / private / torts |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
INSTITUTO MEDICO FAMILIAR DEL ESTE, PSC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
INSTITUTO MEDICO FAMILIAR, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DR. OSCAR GARCIA-ROMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DR. IVONNE MAESTRE-GARCIA
|
|
Defendant
JOHN ROE, husband of Maria M. Betancourt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SIMED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HOGAR LA BELLA UNION, INC., d/b/a Bella Union
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARIA M. BETANCOURT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACQUELINE GARCIA-NAVARRO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 5:03 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #581) filed by Appellant Jacqueline García-Navarro. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/24/2024. 24-1323 (JW) | ||
Att: 1 290 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |