Placeres Millan v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Original Case: 3:20-cv-01602
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01326 |
Type | civil / private / labor (not nlrb) |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
IVAN F. PLACERES-MILLAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 5:03 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #93 ) filed by Appellant Iván F. Placeres-Millán. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 04/24/2024. 24-1326 . CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (ALW) | ||
Att: 1 41 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |