Zachary Knotts v. Keith White
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00028
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01300 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
KEITH WHITE, Esq
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HONORABLE THOMAS A. BEDELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ZACHARY KNOTTS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 4:29 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00028-TSK-MJA. Case manager: RSewell. [1001550329] 24-1300 RHS [Entered: 04/10/2024 09:04 AM] | |
2 | 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Zachary Knotts - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 05/10/2024 Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00028-TSK-MJA.. [1001550347] 24-1300 RHS [Entered: 04/10/2024 09:15 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Fee notice | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs IFP form | ||
3 | 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. [1001550350] Informal Opening Brief due 05/06/2024 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 24-1300 RHS [Entered: 04/10/2024 09:17 AM] |