Steger v. Long Island Railroad Company
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret M Garnett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02730 |
Nature of Suit | 330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability |
Cause | 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 9:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Long Island Railroad Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Glen Steger
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/16 2:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Long Island Railroad Company waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. Document filed by Glen Steger..(Wietzke, Marc) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 04/15 6:28 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/18/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 4/15/2024) (mml) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 9:09 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 9:05 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 9:05 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 9:06 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 8:19 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wietzke, Marc) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 8:18 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Glen Steger..(Wietzke, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 8:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29203372)Document filed by Glen Steger..(Wietzke, Marc) |