Levine et al v. Association of Legal Aid Attorneys UAW Local 2325 et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | P Kevin Castel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02733 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 10:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of New York
New York City Law Department Office of Corporation Counsel 100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007 |
|
Defendant
Legal Aid Attorneys (ALAA), UAW Local 2325
50 Broadway Suite 1600
New York, NY 10004 |
|
Defendant
Legal Aid Society
199 Water Street
New York, NY 10038 |
|
Plaintiff
Arnold Levine
230 Jay St.
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen S. Popper
2939 Ocean Ave.
Brooklyn, NY 11235 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 6:35 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 12:24 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Jeffrey Michael Schwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/22 3:33 PM
MOTION for Jeffrey Michael Schwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arnold Levine, Allen S. Popper..(Schwab, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Schwab, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 04/22 4:08 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Jeffrey Michael Schwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 04/15 3:44 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/28/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: 1-888-363-4749 Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/15/2024) (vfr) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 4:21 PM
ORDER: Prior to taking office as a United States District Judge on November 4, 2003, the undersigned was a member of the board of directors of the Legal Aid Society in the City of New York. I know nothing about this case or claim. I disclose the foregoing and direct that any party or counsel who wishes to make any application or seeks further inquiry do so within ten days hereof. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/12/2024) (vfr) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/12 9:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dean McGee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Legal Aid Attorneys (ALAA), UAW Local 2325. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 9:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 9:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 9:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/11 3:53 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Jeffrey Michael Schwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29207407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Arnold Levine, Allen S. Popper..(Schwab, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/11/2024 (bc) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Schwab, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 9:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGee, Dean) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 9:49 AM
COMPLAINT against City of New York, Legal Aid Attorneys (ALAA), UAW Local 2325, Legal Aid Society. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29203957)Document filed by Arnold Levine, Allen S. Popper..(McGee, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A (Oct. 25, 2023 Letter to Levine) | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/11 4:05 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 3 MOTION for Jeffrey Michael Schwab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29207407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Illinois;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc) |