Juarez v. Krua Thai NYC Corp. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Referred: | Jennifer E Willis |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02736 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 10:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Krua Thai NYC Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Nuntaporn Thongwan
|
|
Plaintiff
Ismael Juarez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/16 10:57 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/15/2024) (vfr) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 11:27 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Krua Thai NYC Corp., Nuntaporn Thongwan. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 11:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Giustino Cilenti to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Form is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/12 11:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Giustino Cilenti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Krua Thai NYC Corp. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 11:23 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 11:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 11:27 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cilenti, Giustino) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 04/11 10:04 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Krua Thai NYC Corp., and Nuntaporn Thongwan, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ismael Juarez..(Cilenti, Giustino) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 10:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cilenti, Giustino) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Krua Thai NYC Corp., Nuntaporn Thongwan. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29204135)Document filed by Ismael Juarez..(Cilenti, Giustino) |