Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Tanya Walton Pratt
Referred: Tim A Baker
Case #: 1:24-cv-00638
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:42 AM EDT
Defendant
EXCENTUS CORPORATION
Represented By
Sean G. Wieber
Winston & Strawn/chicago
contact info
Kevin P. Simpson
Winston & Strawn/chicago
contact info
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
James Randall
Winston & Strawn/chicago
contact info
Defendant
VIBES MEDIA, LLC
Represented By
Paul A. Wolfla
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
Amy E. Richardson
Hwg, LLP
contact info
Jennifer Phurrough Bagg
Hwg, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LESLIE ROLLER
Represented By
Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Smith Krivoshey, PC
contact info
Aleksandr Sasha Litvinov
Smith Krivoshey, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 5:13 PM EDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT against EXCENTUS CORPORATION, VIBES MEDIA, LLC, filed by LESLIE ROLLER. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8110769)(Litvinov, Aleksandr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Text Messages,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons