Budharaju, MD et al v. Mayorkas et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Rose |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00109 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 04/22 8:16 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/19/2024. (zmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/22 8:19 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 5/18/2024; Director of USCIS Cincinnati Field Office answer due 5/18/2024; Secretary of Homeland Security answer due 5/18/2024. (zmc) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 04/18 12:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 5/18/2024. To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of USCIS Cincinnati Field Office, Secretary of Homeland Security. (King, William) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 12:16 PM
(Copy of) COMPLAINT against Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, and Helaine Tasch, filed by Subba Raju Budharaju, MD, Swathi Datla, MD.. (Originally filed in Montgomery County Common Pleas Court, under case number 2024 CV 01568 onNarch 13, 2024.) (srb) |
|
Att: 1 I-797 Notice of Action | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024 CV 01568, filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Helaine Tasch. (King, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Petition for Writ of Mandamus, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Montgomery County Court Docket Report |