Walker v. O'Malley
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan N Bloch |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00542 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:427 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Delores Montgomery on behalf of Martin J O'Malley. (Montgomery, Delores) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only)
Tue 04/16 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Martin J O'Malley ), filed by Sebastian Dayton Walker. (sdp) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 11:20 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the complaint attached to said motion. Signed by Judge Alan N. Bloch on 4/15/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dpo) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Remark
Fri 04/12 3:25 PM
Remark: Plaintiffs attorney added. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sdp) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
ATTORNEY Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 10:53 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Sebastian Dayton Walker. (Harr, E.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Complaint | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/12 12:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy added. (sdp) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/15 11:13 AM
Judge Alan N. Bloch added. (sdp) |