Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 6:24-cv-00185
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 7:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Sophos Ltd
Represented By
Darryl Adams
Slayden Grubert Beard PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Datamonitor Systems LLC
Represented By
Raymond W Mort, III
The Mort Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Wed 09/11 1:17 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (r013)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 09/11 12:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (lad)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 09/10 1:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Sophos Ltd.(Adams, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/13 1:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sophos Ltd as to Sophos Ltd. Waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 9/10/2024. (Adams, Darryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 misc Remark Wed 04/17 11:33 AM
Docs received in Clerk's Office for foreign service via FedEx. Pick up info included. (lad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 04/12 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Sophos Ltd. (cav)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Fri 04/12 9:27 AM
All parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing and shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (cav)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/11 11:09 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Datamonitor Systems LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 04/11 11:08 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 04/11 11:08 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Datamonitor Systems LLC. (Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/11 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18635584), filed by Datamonitor Systems LLC.(Mort, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/12 9:26 AM
Case Randomly assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cav)
Related: [-]