Patel et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Vermont District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey W Crawford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00376 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services 5900 Capital Gateway Dr.
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
|
Plaintiff
Bimal N. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dimpalben S. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gautambhai K. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mayuri N. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nil G. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramilaben G. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vijaykumar V. Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maninder Singh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/12 9:59 AM
ISSUED Summonses as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (law) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 9:38 AM
ORDER granting2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Casazza. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/12/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 6:44 AM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Casazza (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1906597) filed by Bimal N. Patel, Dimpalben S. Patel, Gautambhai K. Patel, Mayuri N. Patel, Nil G. Patel, Ramilaben G. Patel, Vijaykumar V. Patel, Maninder Singh(Forman, Cory) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Casazza, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Nil G. Patel, Mayuri N. Patel, Ramilaben G. Patel, Dimpalben S. Patel, Gautambhai K. Patel, Bimal N. Patel, Vijaykumar V. Patel, Maninder Singh. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1906104)(Casazza, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment Summons as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment Summons as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment Summons as to US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 10 Attachment Summons as to US Attorney's Office | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/11 11:55 AM
This case is assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (kac) |