Jairrabrandy Realty Enterprises LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nancy Hershey Lord |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-41537 |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Jairrabrandy Realty Enterprises LLC
9304 Avenue L
Brooklyn, NY 11236-4807 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order
Thu 04/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/16 10:14 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of NYCTL 1998-2/MTAG (Karavolas, Nickolas) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges
Mon 04/15 10:37 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference via Videoconference. Status hearing to be held on 6/18/2024 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Signed on 4/15/2024 (agh) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4) for Non-Individuals
Mon 04/15 9:28 AM
Refiled Petition Re: Forms Modernization 2015 (Pgs 1-4)for Non-Individuals; NAICS Code added Filed by Vivian M Williams on behalf of Jairrabrandy Realty Enterprises LLC (Williams, Vivian) |
|
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Mon 04/15 9:23 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 24-41537 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22544432. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Mon 04/15 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/15 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Fri 04/12 10:27 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Voluntary Petition [Pages 1-8] due by 4/11/2024. Filing fee for commencing a bankruptcy case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930a due by 4/11/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/11/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/11/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/11/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/11/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/11/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/11/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 4/25/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/25/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/25/2024. Schedule D due 4/25/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/25/2024. Schedule G due 4/25/2024. Schedule H due 4/25/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/25/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/25/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/25/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/25/2024. (nwh) |
|
3 | 3
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee
Thu 04/11 3:09 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/20/2024 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Sussman, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
List of Creditors
Thu 04/11 11:53 AM
List of Creditors Filed by Vivian M Williams on behalf of Jairrabrandy Realty Enterprises LLC (Williams, Vivian) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 04/11 9:31 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Vivian M Williams on behalf of Jairrabrandy Realty Enterprises LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/9/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 08/9/2024. (Williams, Vivian) |
|
court
Prior Filings
Thu 04/11 10:33 AM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 16-41056 nhl dismissed on 07/25/2017; 23-41071 nhl dismissed on 05/25/2023 (drk) |
||
utility
Judge Reassignment Utility
Thu 04/11 10:34 AM
Judge Jil Mazer-Marino removed from the case due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. Judge Nancy Hershey Lord added to the case. (drk) |
||
court
Related Cases
Thu 04/11 10:44 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 16-45450 nhl Angaad Sooknandan dismissed on 01/16/2017 (drk) |