Lakhani v. KRG Miramar Square, LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60568 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
KRG Miramar Square, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tribeca Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Amin Lakhani
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 12:09 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Amin Lakhani. Tribeca Group, LLC served on 4/18/2024, response/answer due 5/9/2024. (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Thu 04/25 11:50 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Amin Lakhani. KRG Miramar Square, LLC served on 4/17/2024, response/answer due 5/8/2024. (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 12:00 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amin Lakhani (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Fri 04/12 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel RE Prior Filings Under the ADA by Glenn R Goldstein on behalf of Amin Lakhani (Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Thu 04/11 3:43 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the Complaint. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to KRG Miramar Square, LLC, Tribeca Group, LLC. (cds) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/11 3:40 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against KRG Miramar Square, LLC, Tribeca Group, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17440051, filed by Amin Lakhani.(Goldstein, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |