Cantrell v. Weiner
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80449 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:0158 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Appeal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USBC-WPB, 24-12123-BKC-MAM |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Appellant
Lisa Ann Cantrell
|
|
Appellee
Robin R. Weiner
Office of the Chapter 13 Trustee PO Box 559007
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33355 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Clerk's Notice (Other) with Optional Ad Hoc NEF
Fri 04/26 10:14 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE to filer re11 MOTION to Correct Docket Entry, Correct Clerk Error, and Change Case. Party Robin R. Weiner was removed from the case per Bankruptcy Court and Motion DE 11, was terminated. (jc) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court
Fri 04/26 9:38 AM
Supplemental Bankruptcy Transmittal to Remove Appellee information . (lam) |
|
Att: 1 Docket Sheet | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 04/22 7:23 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Leave to File Appeal of Bankruptcy Order by Lisa Ann Cantrell. Responses due by 5/6/2024. (cqs) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/22 7:22 AM
NOTICE To Clarify Issue by Lisa Ann Cantrell (cqs) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/17 1:27 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying the Motion at docket entry 8 because the Court cannot discern the relief that is requested in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/17 1:04 PM
MOTION To Expedite Orders On Similar Cases To Save Judaical Costs by Lisa Ann Cantrell.(cqs) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 11:22 AM
NOTICE Of Transfer of Similar Pending Actions by Lisa Ann Cantrell (cqs) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 11:21 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Re: Bankruptcy by Lisa Ann Cantrell (cqs) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court
Fri 04/12 11:01 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL Bankruptcy Transmittal re1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Leave to File Appeal of Bankruptcy Order filed by Lisa Ann Cantrell. (lam) Modified text on 4/12/2024 (jc) |
|
Att: 1 Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 ECF#46 - Order Denying Motion for Leave | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals
Thu 04/11 5:23 PM
New Bankruptcy Appeal Case Filed - Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 04/11 5:21 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court
Thu 04/11 1:09 PM
Bankruptcy Transmittal of re1 Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Leave to File Appeal of Bankruptcy Order filed by Lisa Ann Cantrell.. (lam) |
|
Att: 1 USBC Docket, | ||
Att: 2 USBC Order Being Appealed | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Bankruptcy Motion (Complaint) for Leave to File Appeal of Bankruptcy Order - CV - NO FEE
Thu 04/11 1:04 PM
MOTION (COMPLAINT) for Leave to File Appeal of Bankruptcy Order filed by Lisa Ann Cantrell. Bankruptcy Court case number 24-12123 BKC-MAM. (lam) |