Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-08036

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00116
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Buddy Ford
Represented By
Susan R Peters
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Aram Papkin Megerian
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
New Orleans Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Asset Management, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Monier Rahall
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Union Street Land Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
TST Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
The 409-411 Cleveland Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Seventh Avenue Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Poinsettia Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Ola Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
North 17th Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
North 12th Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Mulberry Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Mallard Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Magnolia Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Dry Creek Properties, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonita Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc.
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Capital Markets, Inc.
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Asset Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis 13th Ave Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
ACM Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
1816 E. Wood Land Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I Rubaii
Jawdet I Rubaii, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
16 16 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 03/14 8:53 AM
Proof of Service of Order on Pretrial/Status Conference. Filed by Aram Papken Megerian on behalf of Defendant Buddy Ford Related [+]. (Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 03/11 2:18 PM
Order On Pretrial Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2025 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Aram Megerian is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Juan)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 03/03 5:30 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via zoom: Aram Megerian, Buddy Ford, Jawdet Rubaii RULING: Continued Pretrial / Status Conference ...Adversary ABATED (no hearings will be set, no discovery will be taken); Continued Pretrial Status Conference set 11/10/2025 at 11:00 a.m. - Order by Megerian... NOTE: [ Judge discussed - during the status conference, the Court dispensed with the negative notice procedure ] Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Aram Papken Megerian on behalf of Defendant Buddy Ford. (Megerian, Aram) Doc. #13 ...to be set 11/10/2025 at 11:00 a.m.... All parties may attend the hearing in person. Parties are directed to review Judge McEwen's Procedures Governing Court Appearances (available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/tampa/mcewen/Judge_McEwen_Hearing_Procedures.pdf) for her policies and procedures for remote attendance at hearings by video or telephone via Zoom. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
court Mon 03/03 7:23 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 11/10/2025 11:00 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses Contains Negative Notice Doc13 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, February 27, 2025
13 13 motion Motion to Amend (AP) Thu 02/27 2:11 PM
Motion to Amend for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Aram Papken Megerian on behalf of Defendant Buddy Ford. (Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
12 12 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 01/13 11:09 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via zoom: Buddy Ford, Aram Megerian, Jawdet Rubaii RULING: Continued Pretrial / Status Conference ...Continued in open court to 3/3/2025 at 11:00 a.m. - no further notice will be given... All parties may attend the hearing in person. Parties are directed to review Judge McEwen's Procedures Governing Court Appearances (available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/tampa/mcewen/Judge_McEwen_Hearing_Procedures.pdf) for her policies and procedures for remote attendance at hearings by video or telephone via Zoom. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
11 11 misc Proof of Service (AP) Tue 10/29 2:41 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Extend Time. Filed by Jawdet I Rubaii on behalf of Plaintiffs 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Union Street Land Trust Related [+]. (Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 order Extend Time Tue 10/29 1:58 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time (Deadline Extended Through October 4, 2024) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jawdet Rubaii is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Juan)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Fri 09/20 12:47 PM
Motion to Extend Time as to Order on Pretrial/Status Conference (Paragraph 1) Filed by Jawdet I Rubaii on behalf of Plaintiffs 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Union Street Land Trust Related [+]. (Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-] 7
Saturday, June 29, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 06/30 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 06/27 8:25 AM
Order on Pretrial/Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 1/13/2025 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Aram Megerian is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
6 6 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 06/18 1:24 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via zoom: Aram Megerian, Jawdett Rubaii, Jonathan Semach RULING: Pretrial / Status Conference ...It is not the Court's intention to consider any Motion practice at this time, however, Court requires parties to discuss, stipulate discovery staging and comply with 26(a)1(A) and 26(a)3 [to the extent that it relates to 26(a)1(A) disclosures, deferred as to 26(a)2, Conference and Disclosures to be completed by 9/20/2024 (Pretrial / Status Conference set 1/13/2025 at 11:00 a.m.) - Order by Megerian... For remote appearances, please refer to Judge McEwen's webpage at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/tampa/mcewen/Judge_McEwen_Hearing_Procedures.pdf Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Report (AP) Mon 06/17 8:46 AM
Status Report Filed by Jawdet I Rubaii on behalf of Plaintiffs 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Union Street Land Trust, Defendant Buddy Ford. (Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 18, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sun 05/19 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Thu 05/16 2:21 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Tonya)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 11, 2024
2 2 court Manual Entry Thu 04/11 11:49 AM
Copy of Transmitted District Court No. 8:23-cv-02084-MSS-NHA:COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 23-CA-014697 filed in State Court on 8/22/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21252779 filed by Buddy D. Ford.(Megerian, Aram) . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-2084-MSS-UAM
Att: 2 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov.
Att: 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jawdet I. Rubaii & Aram Papkin Megerian of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation
Att: 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Aram Papkin Megerian on behalf of Buddy D. Ford. Lead Counsel: Aram P. Megerian.
Att: 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Buddy D. Ford
Att: 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of case law)(Rubaii, Jawdet)
Att: 7 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Buddy D. Ford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)
Att: 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by All Plaintiffs.
Att: 9 First MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Buddy D. Ford.
Att: 10 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING 9 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report; and STAYING Case Management Report deadline pending resolution of Plaintiffs' motion to remand. The Parties shall file a Case Management Report, if warranted, thirty (30) days after the Court enters an Order on Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/31/2023.
Att: 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 First MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by All Plaintiffs.
Att: 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Refer Case to Bankruptcy Court. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including November 20, 2023, to file a response. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11
Att: 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 First MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court and Objection filed by 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc.,
Att: 14 Case Reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:23-cv-02084-MSS-NHA. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case
Att: 15 NOTICE of Inquiry by Buddy D. Ford
Att: 16 ORDER DENYING 7 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court and GRANTING 10 Defendant's Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2024.
Att: 17 TRANSMITTAL to bankruptcy court re 17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Copies sent to Trustee, Bankruptcy Judge and Bankruptcy Clerk.
Att: 18 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket af
Att: 19 Copy of District Court Docket case8-23-cv-2084-MSS-NHA
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Notice of Removal Wed 04/10 7:42 PM
Notice of Transmittal of Copy of Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court and Granting Defendant's Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. Filing Fee Paid in District Court $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21252779 Nature of Suit: [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Anel) Modified on 4/10/2024 (Anel)
Related: [-]