Robinson v. Experian Information Solutions, LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02163 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 11:10 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Felicia Lum Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/25 9:58 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Felicia Lum Robinson.. (Albanese, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/16 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felicia Lum Robinson. Experian Information Solutions, LLC served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Albanese, John) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 9:53 AM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 4 John G. Albanese's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/11 11:24 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/11 9:43 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/11 9:28 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19310452.) filed by Felicia Lum Robinson.(Albanese, John) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 04/11 9:24 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Felicia Lum Robinson (Pollock, Julie) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 9:22 AM
Proposed Summons. (Pollock, Julie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19310408.). Filed by Felicia Lum Robinson.(Pollock, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |