Maryland District Court
Judge:Gina L Simms
Case #: 8:24-cv-01060
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Amica Mutual Insurance Company
PO BOX 9690
Providence, RI 02940
Represented By
Timothy Edward Howie
Howie Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David L. Duringer
11424 Brandywine Rd.
Clinton, MD 20735
Represented By
Michael A Klopfer
Law Office Of James E. Farmer, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
35 35 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/15 8:54 AM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 5/14/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
36 36 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 05/15 11:09 AM
QC NOTICE:34 Notice (Other) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 5:53 PM
NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company of Plaintiff's 6-18-25 Deposition (Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
33 33 corresp Status Report Submitted Wed 05/14 4:40 PM
Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Deadlines by David L. Duringer(Klopfer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
32 32 order Order Fri 01/24 3:59 PM
Paperless ORDER rescheduling settlement conference for 7/16/2025. The parties must still abide by the pre-conference requirements outlined in ECF 29. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 1/24/2025. (da3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
31 31 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/17 8:55 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Status Report due by 5/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 1/16/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Status Report Thu 01/16 2:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Updated Joint Status Report and Joint Motion to Continue Settlement Conference and Extend Deadlines by Amica Mutual Insurance Company(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed amended scheduling order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 10/24 8:20 AM
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/23/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/17 9:30 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/17/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
27 27 corresp Status Report Submitted Thu 09/12 6:48 PM
Status Report Submitted by the Parties by David L. Duringer (Klopfer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
26 26 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Thu 07/18 2:55 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 7/18/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
25 25 21 pgs order Order Thu 06/27 9:05 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/27/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/27 9:02 AM
LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/27/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
23 23 corresp Magistrate Judge - consent/decline Wed 06/26 9:51 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
22 22 corresp Magistrate Judge - consent/decline Tue 06/11 3:25 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Klopfer, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 06/11 3:10 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER On May 23, 2024, the District Court entered an order. See ECF No. 20. By no later than June 24, 2024, the parties are directed to review ECF No. 20 and proceed in accordance with the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 6/11/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order re: Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) Thu 05/23 1:11 PM
ORDER directing the parties to submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re19 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/23/2024. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/23 1:09 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/23/2024. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 05/16 12:29 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File Answer. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/16/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/16 12:08 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/16/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 05/16 11:20 AM
Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2024 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
15 15 misc Local Rule Fri 05/10 2:15 PM
Local Rule 103.5a Certification of filing of state court documents(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Maryland Judiciary Case Search Results
Monday, May 06, 2024
notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/06 11:24 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for May 16, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 05161100 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/01 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/12/2024. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/30/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/30 4:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Amica Mutual Insurance Company(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for leave re late filing of answer
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/30 4:30 PM
Federal Court ANSWER to Complaint by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 04/30 2:53 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
notice Deficiency Notice Fri 04/26 3:53 PM
Deficiency Notice as to Amica Mutual Insurance Company's-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/3/2024 (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
9 9 misc Local Rule Thu 04/25 5:47 PM
Local Rule Standing Order 2021-13(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/25 5:35 PM
NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company Letter of intention to file a motion (Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/25 12:35 PM
Amica Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to3 Complaint filed in Prince George's County Circuit Court prior to removal of case to federal court by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Notice of Removal from Circuit Court
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/23 3:22 PM
ORDER Directing defendant to file an answer within 7 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/23/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 04/18 7:07 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Fri 04/12 9:28 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 04/12 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Amica Mutual Insurance Company, filed by David L. Duringer.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Information Report
2 2 order Case Management Order Thu 04/11 4:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/11/2024. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 04/11 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's Circuit Court, case number C-16-CV-001235. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11199591), filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Howie, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Fri 04/12 9:27 AM
Jury Trial Demand by David L. Duringer(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Fri 04/12 9:27 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]