Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:24-cv-00615
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 4:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.
Represented By
Cody B. Hoesly
Barg Singer Hoesly PC
contact info
Plaintiff
I.S.S.C., Inc.
Represented By
Paul Bruene
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Curt Roy Hineline
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
21 21 notice Notice Thu 08/22 2:48 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
Related: [-]
order Dismissal -Terminate Case Thu 08/22 4:20 PM
Order of Dismissal. In accord with the parties' Notice of Stipulated Dismissal Without Prejudice (ECF No.21 ), this case is dismissed without prejudice. Pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
order Order on Motion Wed 07/24 2:13 PM
ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Postpone Case Deadlines (ECF No.19 ). Case management deadlines are stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay (ECF No.10 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
19 19 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Mon 07/22 4:26 PM
Unopposed Motion to Postpone Case Deadlines . Filed by Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hoesly, Cody)
Related: [-]
18 18 resp Response to Motion Mon 07/22 2:50 PM
Reply to Motion for Stay 10 . Filed by Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hoesly, Cody) Modified to correct docket text on 7/22/2024 (gd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 06/26 11:29 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Stay 10 . Filed by Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hoesly, Cody)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 06/26 2:03 PM
ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.16 ). Defendant's Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay (ECF No.10 ) is due by 7/22/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
15 15 resp Response to Motion Thu 06/20 4:56 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay 10 Oral Argument requested. Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 06/05 11:54 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time , Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Stay 10 . Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 06/05 1:37 PM
ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No.13 ). Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay (ECF No.10 ), is due by 6/20/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
12 12 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/20 4:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hoesly, Cody)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_sup Declaration Mon 05/20 4:05 PM
Declaration of Cody Hoesly . Filed by Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. Related [+] (Hoesly, Cody)
Related: [-] Motion for Stay10 .
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14
10 10 motion Stay Mon 05/20 3:58 PM
Motion for Stay . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hoesly, Cody)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/17 8:23 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey, ECF8 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman.Modified on 5/17/2024 to correct judge (mja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
8 8 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/16 9:49 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9417140. Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc.. (Brandfield-Harvey, Cornelia)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 05/16 10:03 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cornelia Brandfield-Harvey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-94171408 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
6 6 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 4:06 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Paul Bruene. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9403723. Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc.. (Bruene, Paul)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/06 4:21 PM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Paul Bruene. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-94037236 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (dino)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 5:28 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 6 by attorney Paul Bruene. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice Wed 05/01 2:34 PM
Notice of Filing Proof of Service Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/15 9:58 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Metro Metals Northwest, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (dino)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 04/11 12:56 PM
Proposed Return of Service Unexecuted as to Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 04/11 11:02 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/9/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/9/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 9/9/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (dino)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/11 10:09 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9364704 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by I.S.S.C., Inc. against Metro Metals Northwest, Inc.. (Hineline, Curt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons