MB 1607 LLC v. Mt Hawley Insurance Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph Dawson, III |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-01798 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Horry County Court of Common Pleas, 2024CP2601650 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Mt Hawley Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MB 1607 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/01 11:03 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION to Transfer Case by MB 1607 LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/15/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Locklair, Laura) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/19 1:52 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/13/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/24/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 5/24/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/14/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/15/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/14/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/14/2024, Discovery due by 10/15/2024, Motions due by 11/14/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 2/12/2025, Mediation Due by 10/15/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 4/19/2024. (lgib, ) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/18 11:52 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Mt Hawley Insurance Company.(Lyles, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
20
pgs
motion
Transfer Case
Thu 04/18 11:51 AM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Mt Hawley Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 5/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Lyles, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 27, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 28, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 29, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 30, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 31, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 32, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 33, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 34, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 35, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 36, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 37, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 38, | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit 39, | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit 40, | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit 41, | ||
Att: 42 Exhibit 42, | ||
Att: 43 Exhibit 43, | ||
Att: 44 Exhibit 44 | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 04/11 1:40 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mt Hawley Insurance Company.(swel, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP2601650. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11702523), filed by Mt Hawley Insurance Company.(swel, ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents (Exhibits 1 - 5), | ||
Att: 2 (Exhibit 6) Neal McLoughlin Loss Consultant estimate |