Mani Aca v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Vermont District Court | |
Judge: | Geoffrey W Crawford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00381 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services 5900 Capital Gateway Dr.
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
|
Plaintiff
Angelica Mani Aca
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons (re: complaint) Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 04/26 8:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/22/2024, answer due 6/21/2024.(Casazza, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/12 10:29 AM
ISSUED Summonses as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (law) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 9:42 AM
ORDER granting2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Casazza. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 4/12/2024. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/12 6:42 AM
MOTION for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Casazza (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number AVTDC-1906596) filed by Angelica Mani Aca(Forman, Cory) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Casazza, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Angelica Mani Aca. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1906195)(Casazza, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment Summons as to USCIS, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment Summons as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment Summons as to US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment Summons as to US Attorney's Office | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/11 12:59 PM
This case is assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (kac) |