Hill v. Taylor et al (INMATE 1)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Emily C Marks |
Referred: | Jerusha T Adams |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 04/26 3:10 PM
ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at RUSSELL COUNTY JAIL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/26/2024. (CWL) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 04/25 10:51 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathaniel Lamar Hill.(GGN) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 1:21 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that, on or before April 26, 2024, Plaintiff must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk showing the average monthly balance in and average monthly deposits to his prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his Complaint. Plaintiff is cautioned that, if he fails to comply with this Order, the undersigned Magistrate Judge will recommend dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/11/2024. (See Order for Details) c/s as Directed)) (LAB) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit
Thu 04/11 2:20 PM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Nathaniel Lamar Hill. (TPS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Inmate 1983 Complaint
Thu 04/11 2:19 PM
Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Steve Johnson, Heath Taylor, filed by Nathaniel Lamar Hill.(TPS) |