Moland v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Shelly D Dick |
Referred: | Erin Wilder-Doomes |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00296 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 18th Judiical District Court, 1048881 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Moland
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
90 Day Conference Order
Mon 04/29 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/29/2024. (BLR) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Exhibits to Document
Fri 04/12 5:47 PM
Exhibit(s) to1 Notice of Removal, by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A State Court Pleadings 18th JDC, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Doreen Similton | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedures III(A)(1)
Fri 04/12 3:14 PM
Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to1 Notice of Removal,4 Notice of Compliance. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo) . REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. Each exhibit MUST include a description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). (EDC) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Compliance
Thu 04/11 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Compliance by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company to1 Notice of Removal,(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 04/11 1:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Donovan, James) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 1:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Donovan, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
Thu 04/11 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC, Case Number 1048881. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2738991), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Donovan, James) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit |