14
|
|
14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 1:22 PM
NOTICE of appearance by David S. Bell on behalf of Adams & Joseph, Inc. (Attorney David S. Bell added to party Adams & Joseph, Inc.(pty:clm))(Bell, David)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 12:39 PM
NOTICE of appearance by David S. Bell on behalf of Adam A Abbas (Attorney David S. Bell added to party Adam A Abbas(pty:clm))(Bell, David) Modified on 5/1/2024 main document 13 replaced at the request of counsel to correct filing.NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/01 12:37 PM
NOTICE of appearance by David S. Bell on behalf of Sammy A Joseph (Attorney David S. Bell added to party Sammy A Joseph(pty:clm))(Bell, David)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Wed 04/24 1:44 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Real Property(known as 3540 SW Pryor Road, Lees Summit, Missouri). Real Property(known as 3540 SW Pryor Road, Lees Summit, Missouri) served on 4/23/2024. (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Wed 04/24 1:43 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Real Property(known as 8600 Noland Road, Kansas City, Missouri). Real Property(known as 8600 Noland Road, Kansas City, Missouri) served on 4/23/2024. (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Wed 04/24 1:41 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Adam A Abbas. Adam A Abbas served on 4/16/2024. (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Wed 04/24 1:39 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Adams & Joseph, Inc.. Adams & Joseph, Inc. served on 4/16/2024. (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Wed 04/24 9:31 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to $968,144.76 from Security Bank of Kansas City account number x7589. Sammy A Joseph served on 4/16/2024. (Bradshaw, Stephanie) Modified on 4/24/2024: Docket text modified to reflect filing document. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Thu 04/18 1:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to $29,496.71 from Security Bank of Kansas City account number x8468, $968,144.76 from Security Bank of Kansas City account number x7589, United States Currency. $29,496.71 from Security Bank of Kansas City account number x8468, $968,144.76 from Security Bank of Kansas City account number x7589, United States Currency served on April 18, 2024. (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 04/16 9:11 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Adam A. Abbas by United States of America (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 04/16 9:07 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Adams & Joseph, Inc. by United States of America (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 04/16 9:05 AM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Sammy A. Joseph by United States of America (Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
order
Order Transferring/Reassigning Case
Thu 04/11 3:23 PM
Administrative Transfer. Case reassigned to District Judge Howard F. Sachs for all further proceedings due to related case. Magistrate Judge W. Brian Gaddy no longer assigned to case. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants filed by Stephanie Carol Bradshaw on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 7/10/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Bradshaw, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|